PA SB799 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-14 - Act No. 145
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-14 - Act No. 145
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 20, 1982 (P.L.1404, No.325), known as the Self-Service Storage Facility Act, further providing for definitions, for enforcement of lien, for notice and for limitation on liability of owner.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for enforcement of lien, for notice and for limitation on liability of owner.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Robbins [R] | Sen. Richard Alloway [R] | Sen. Richard Kasunic [D] | Sen. Timothy Solobay [D] |
Sen. Christine Tartaglione [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-19 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-14 | House | Act No. 145 |
2014-10-14 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-08 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-08 | House | Signed in House |
2014-10-07 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (182-14) |
2014-10-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-10-06 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-10-06 | House | Second consideration |
2014-09-24 | House | Removed from table |
2014-07-02 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-07-02 | House | Removed from table |
2014-06-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-06-10 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-10 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-05-01 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |
2014-04-29 | House | In the House |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (43-3) |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-03-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |