PA SB795 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-28 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-28 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Pennsylvania State Police and the Governor, to grant and convey to Robert Swingle, certain lands and improvements situate in the Township of Richmond, Tioga County.
Title
Authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Pennsylvania State Police and the Governor, to grant and convey to Robert Swingle, certain lands and improvements situate in the Township of Richmond, Tioga County.
Sponsors
Sen. Cris Dush [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 795 PN 950, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-21 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-21 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-28 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2021-09-27 | House | In the House |
2021-09-27 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-09-21 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |