PA SB775 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 16 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-10 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 2, 1915 (P.L.736, No.338), known as the Workers' Compensation Act, in interpretation and definitions, further providing for definitions; and, in liability and compensation, further providing for compensation for post-traumatic stress injury.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In interpretation and definitions, further providing for definitions; and, in liability and compensation, further providing for compensation for post-traumatic stress injury.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-10SenateRemoved from table
2021-11-10SenateLaid on the table
2021-09-29SenateSecond consideration
2021-09-28SenateFirst consideration
2021-09-28SenateReported as committed
2021-06-16SenateReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback