PA SB774 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-07-05 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-07-05 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 11 (Cities) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in city administrator, further providing for appointment of city administrator, for employment agreement, for residency and elective city office and for powers and duties; and, in accounts and finances, further providing for powers and duties of chief fiscal officer.
Title
In city administrator, further providing for appointment of city administrator, for employment agreement, for residency and elective city office and for powers and duties; and, in accounts and finances, further providing for powers and duties of chief fiscal officer.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Hutchinson [R] | Sen. Cris Dush [R] | Sen. Rosemary Brown [R] | Sen. Timothy Kearney [D] |
Sen. Carolyn Comitta [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 774 PN 873, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-05 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2023-06-30 | House | In the House |
2023-06-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-06-21 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |