PA SB772 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 136
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 136
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 24, 1931 (P.L.1206, No.331), known as The First Class Township Code, in auditors, further providing for surcharges, auditors' report and publication of financial statements.
Title
In auditors, further providing for surcharges, auditors' report and publication of financial statements.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas McGarrigle [R] | Sen. John Eichelberger [R] | Sen. Scott Hutchinson [R] | Sen. John Blake [D] |
Sen. Judy Schwank [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: SB 772 PN 970, FP (Y: 182 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 772 PN 970, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 772 PN 970, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-24 | House | Act No. 136 |
2018-10-24 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2018-10-18 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2018-10-17 | House | Signed in House |
2018-10-17 | House | Signed in Senate |
2018-10-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (182-0) |
2018-10-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-10-16 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-10-16 | House | Second consideration |
2018-10-15 | House | Removed from table |
2018-06-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-06-20 | House | First consideration |
2018-06-20 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-06-06 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-06-04 | House | In the House |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |