PA SB772 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Act No. 53
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Act No. 53
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 23, 1972 (P.L.136, No.52), known as the Professional Psychologists Practice Act, further providing for definitions, for necessity for license, for qualifications for license, for refusal, suspension or revocation of license and for reporting of multiple licensure; making editorial changes; and making a related repeal.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for necessity for license, for qualifications for license, for refusal, suspension or revocation of license and for reporting of multiple licensure; making editorial changes; and making a related repeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 772 PN 1879, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - House - House Floor: SB 772 PN 1879, FP (Y: 187 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A07263 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 772 PN 825, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - House - House Floor: SB 772 PN 1879, FP (Y: 187 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A07263 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 772 PN 825, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | Senate | Act No. 53 |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Signed in House |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (49-0) |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2016-06-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-06-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (187-4) |
2016-06-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-08 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-06-08 | House | Second consideration |
2016-06-07 | House | Removed from table |
2016-06-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-06-06 | House | First consideration |
2016-06-06 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-10-19 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2015-10-13 | House | In the House |
2015-10-13 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-09-28 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-06-09 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |