PA SB756 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-3)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-10 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-10 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in preliminary provisions, providing for assessments for Federal accountability; in duties and powers of boards of school directors, further providing for publication of rules, regulations and policies; in professional employees, further providing for rating system; and, in high schools, further providing for high school certificates.
Title
In preliminary provisions, providing for assessments for Federal accountability; in duties and powers of boards of school directors, further providing for publication of rules, regulations and policies; in professional employees, further providing for rating system; and, in high schools, further providing for high school certificates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-10 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2017-06-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |