PA SB755 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 27 2007 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 19
Status: Enrolled on June 27 2007 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 19
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 11, 1889 (P.L.188, No.210), entitled "A further supplement to an act, entitled 'An act to establish a board of wardens for the Port of Philadelphia, and for the regulation of pilots and pilotage, and for other purposes,' approved March twenty-ninth, one thousand eight hundred and three, and for regulating the rates of pilotage and number of pilots," further providing for certain charges.
Title
An Act amending the act of May 11, 1889 (P.L.188, No.210), entitled "A further supplement to an act, entitled 'An act to establish a board of wardens for the Port of Philadelphia, and for the regulation of pilots and pilotage, and for other purposes,' approved March twenty-ninth, one thousand eight hundred and three, and for regulating the rates of pilotage and number of pilots," further providing for certain charges.
Sponsors
Sen. Edwin Erickson [R] | Sen. Stewart Greenleaf [R] | Sen. Dominic Pileggi [R] | Sen. John Rafferty [R] |
Sen. Mike Stack [D] | Sen. Robert Tomlinson [R] | Sen. Robert Wonderling [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-06-30 | Approved by the Governor | |
2007-06-27 | Presented to the Governor | |
2007-06-26 | Signed in House | |
2007-06-26 | Signed in Senate | |
2007-06-26 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-06-25 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-06-21 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-06-21 | Second consideration | |
2007-06-19 | Removed from table | |
2007-06-12 | Laid on the table | |
2007-06-12 | First consideration | |
2007-06-12 | Reported as committed | |
2007-05-29 | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE | |
2007-05-08 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-05-07 | Second consideration | |
2007-05-01 | First consideration | |
2007-05-01 | Reported as committed | |
2007-04-10 | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=755 |