PA SB735 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, further providing for qualifications of electors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, further providing for qualifications of electors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 735 PN 952, Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 735 PN 899, 2021 A19650, Motion to Table CAPPELLETTI Amendment No. A-1965 (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 735 PN 899, 2021 A19540, FONTANA Amendment No. A-1954 (Y: 18 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 735 PN 899, 2021 A19310, BOSCOLA Amendment No. A-1931 (Y: 21 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 735 PN 899, 2021 A19090, Motion to Table MUTH Amendment No. A-1909 (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 735 PN 899, 2021 A19770, WARD, J. Amendment No. A-1977 (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-24HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2021-06-23HouseIn the House
2021-06-23SenateThird consideration and final passage (30-20)
2021-06-23SenateAmended on third consideration (32-18)
2021-06-21SenateRe-reported as committed
2021-06-16SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-06-16SenateSecond consideration
2021-06-15SenateFirst consideration
2021-06-15SenateReported as amended
2021-06-11SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=735
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0735&pn=0883
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0735&pn=0899
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0735&pn=0952
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/SFN/2021/0/SB0735P0899.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=41&theDate=06/15/2021&RollCallId=306
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/21/2021&RollCallId=372
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=201
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=202
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=203
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=204
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=205
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=207

Bill Comments 750

feedback