PA SB735 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-25 - Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS
Pending: House Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-25 - Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS
Pending: House Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 7, 1947 (P.L.1368, No.542), known as the Real Estate Tax Sale Law, further providing for the title of the act; and, in sale of property, providing for optional county demolition and rehabilitation fund.
Title
Further providing for the title of the act; and, in sale of property, providing for optional county demolition and rehabilitation fund.
Sponsors
Sen. James Brewster [D] | Sen. Wayne Fontana [D] | Sen. David Argall [R] | Sen. John Rafferty [R] |
Sen. Kim Ward [R] | Sen. Camera Bartolotta [R] | Sen. Jay Costa [D] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] |
Sen. Vincent Hughes [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 735 PN 1909, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |
2018-06-22 | House | In the House |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-04-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING |