PA SB729 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-24 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-24 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in school safety and security, further providing for School Safety and Security Grant Program and for school safety and security training; providing for threat assessment; and, in school health services, further providing for confidentiality, transference and removal of health records.
Title
In school safety and security, further providing for School Safety and Security Grant Program and for school safety and security training; providing for threat assessment; and, in school health services, further providing for confidentiality, transference and removal of health records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-11 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |