PA SB726 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 13, 1988 (P.L.530, No.94), known as the Environmental Hearing Board Act, further providing for definitions and for jurisdiction.
Title
Further providing for definitions and for jurisdiction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-22 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2019-10-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |