PA SB723 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-6)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-14 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-14 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in high schools, further providing for courses of study.
Title
In high schools, further providing for courses of study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-14 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-11-14 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2017-11-13 | Senate | Removed from table |
2017-07-27 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2017-06-28 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |