PA SB688 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Act No. 10A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Act No. 10A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making appropriations from the Philadelphia Taxicab and Limousine Regulatory Fund and the Philadelphia Taxicab Medallion Fund to the Philadelphia Parking Authority for fiscal year July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2018.
Title
Making appropriations from the Philadelphia Taxicab and Limousine Regulatory Fund and the Philadelphia Taxicab Medallion Fund to the Philadelphia Parking Authority for fiscal year July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2018.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-09 - House - House Floor: SB 688 PN 1033, FP (Y: 162 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 688 PN 1033, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 688 PN 1033, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | House | Act No. 10A |
2017-07-21 | House | Became Law without Governor's signature |
2017-07-10 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2017-07-10 | House | Signed in House |
2017-07-09 | House | Signed in Senate |
2017-07-09 | House | Third consideration and final passage (162-26) |
2017-06-30 | House | Second consideration |
2017-06-30 | House | Removed from table |
2017-06-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-06-29 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-29 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-06-29 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-28 | House | In the House |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-06-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |