PA SB676 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 132
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 2, 1915 (P.L.736, No.338), known as the Workers' Compensation Act, in liability and compensation, further providing for injuries outside this Commonwealth; in procedure, further providing for the Workmen's Compensation Administration Fund; and, in the Uninsured Employers Guaranty Fund, further providing for definitions, for fund, for claims, for claim petition, for department and for assessments and transfers and providing for uninsured employer obligations and for administrative penalties and stop-work orders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In liability and compensation, further providing for injuries outside this Commonwealth; in procedure, further providing for the Workmen's Compensation Administration Fund; and, in the Uninsured Employers Guaranty Fund, further providing for definitions, for fund, for claims, for claim petition, for department and for assessments and transfers and providing for uninsured employer obligations and for administrative penalties and stop-work orders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: SB 676 PN 1289, FP (Y: 185 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - House - House Floor: SB 676 PN 2051, MOT REV PRIOR PR, WHITE (Y: 186 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-10-01 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-01 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A07275 (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A07087 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 676 PN 1289, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 676 PN 1022, A4351, GORDNER AMENDMENT NO. A-4351 (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-24HouseAct No. 132
2018-10-24HouseApproved by the Governor
2018-10-18HousePresented to the Governor
2018-10-17HouseSigned in House
2018-10-17HouseSigned in Senate
2018-10-17HouseThird consideration and final passage (185-0)
2018-10-17HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-10-16HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-10-16HouseSecond consideration
2018-10-16HouseMotion to revert to Printer's No. 1289 (186-3)
2018-10-15HouseRemoved from table
2018-10-01HouseLaid on the table
2018-10-01HouseFirst consideration
2018-10-01HouseReported as amended
2017-10-26HouseReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
2017-10-25HouseIn the House
2017-10-25SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2017-10-24SenateAmended on third consideration (48-2)
2017-10-16SenateRe-reported as committed
2017-06-27SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-27SenateSecond consideration
2017-06-26SenateFirst consideration
2017-06-26SenateReported as amended
2017-05-04SenateReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=676
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0676&pn=0795
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0676&pn=1022
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0676&pn=1289
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0676&pn=2051
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=13&theDate=06/26/2017&RollCallId=336
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/16/2017&RollCallId=463
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=308
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=317
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=06/04/2018&RollCallId=1975
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=10/01/2018&RollCallId=1973
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=10/01/2018&RollCallId=1974
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1570
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/17/2018&RollCallId=2081
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1612

Bill Comments

feedback