PA SB668 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 19, 1979 (P.L.130, No.48), known as the Health Care Facilities Act, providing for certified medication aides; and imposing duties on the Department of Education.
Title
Providing for certified medication aides; and imposing duties on the Department of Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A03757 (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 668 PN 1180, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-24 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Adopt Amendment A02666 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-24 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 668 PN 1180, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-24 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Adopt Amendment A02666 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-24 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-03-27 | House | First consideration |
2024-03-27 | House | Reported as amended |
2023-11-15 | House | Referred to HEALTH |
2023-11-14 | House | In the House |
2023-11-14 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2023-11-13 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-10-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |