PA SB662 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-29 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-29 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses) and 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in assault, providing for the offense of drug delivery resulting in serious bodily injury; and, in sentencing, providing for sentencing for drug delivery resulting in serious bodily injury.
Title
In assault, providing for the offense of drug delivery resulting in serious bodily injury; and, in sentencing, providing for sentencing for drug delivery resulting in serious bodily injury.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 662 PN 1027, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2017-06-28 | House | In the House |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-06-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |