PA SB653 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-10-01 - Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
Pending: Senate Rules & Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of December 31, 1965 (P.L.1257, No.511), known as The Local Tax Enabling Act, in local taxes, further providing for collection; in consolidated collection of local income taxes, further providing for tax collection committees , for declaration and payment of income taxes and for powers and duties of tax officer; in collection of delinquent taxes, further providing for costs of collection; and making a related editorial change.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In local taxes, further providing for collection; in consolidated collection of local income taxes, further providing for tax collection committees , for declaration and payment of income taxes and for powers and duties of tax officer; in collection of delinquent taxes, further providing for costs of collection; and making a related editorial change.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-01 - House - House Floor: SB 653 PN 2025, FP (Y: 137 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Floor: SB 653 PN 1905, 2017 A8927, PEIFER (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A08108 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 653 PN 1660, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-01SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2018-10-01SenateIn the Senate
2018-10-01HouseThird consideration and final passage (137-45)
2018-10-01HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-09-25HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-09-25HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2018-06-22HouseRemoved from table
2018-06-21HouseLaid on the table
2018-06-21HouseFirst consideration
2018-06-21HouseReported as amended
2018-04-23HouseReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2018-04-18HouseIn the House
2018-04-18SenateThird consideration and final passage (39-10)
2018-04-17SenateAmended on third consideration
2018-02-06SenateRemoved from table
2018-02-06SenateLaid on the table
2017-12-11SenateRe-reported as amended
2017-06-14SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-14SenateSecond consideration
2017-06-13SenateFirst consideration
2017-06-13SenateReported as amended
2017-05-24SenateReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=653
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0653&pn=0892
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0653&pn=0942
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0653&pn=1374
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0653&pn=1660
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0653&pn=1905
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0653&pn=2025
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=15&theDate=06/13/2017&RollCallId=247
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=12/11/2017&RollCallId=568
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=464
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=06/21/2018&RollCallId=1790
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=06/21/2018&RollCallId=1791
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1468
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1488
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/01/2018&RollCallId=1983

Bill Comments

feedback