PA SB622 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-21 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-21 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in powers and duties in general, providing for contact information.
Title
In powers and duties in general, providing for contact information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-06-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |