PA SB622 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Act No. 118
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Act No. 118
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for the licensure of persons providing debt settlement services, for powers and duties of the Department of Banking and Securities and for enforcement; imposing civil penalties; and making a related repeal.
Title
Providing for the licensure of persons providing debt settlement services, for powers and duties of the Department of Banking and Securities and for enforcement; imposing civil penalties; and making a related repeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-01 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-11 - Senate - SB 622 PN 1641, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-09 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-11 - Senate - SB 622 PN 1641, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-09 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-09 | Senate | Act No. 118 |
2014-07-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (50-0) |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2014-06-29 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-06-29 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-6) |
2014-06-29 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-27 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-27 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2014-06-25 | House | Removed from table |
2014-06-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-06-24 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-24 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-12-16 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |
2013-12-11 | House | In the House |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-12-09 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |