PA SB617 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: House Labor And Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: House Labor And Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for family and medical leave for eligible employees.
Title
Providing for family and medical leave for eligible employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 617 PN 694, Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2022-06-15 | House | In the House |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-3) |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Removed from table |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Removed from table |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2021-05-26 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |