PA SB592 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-21 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-21 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in duties and powers of boards of school directors, providing for posting of offers of employment for certain administrators; and, in intermediate units, providing for posting of offers of employment for certain staff.
Title
In duties and powers of boards of school directors, providing for posting of offers of employment for certain administrators; and, in intermediate units, providing for posting of offers of employment for certain staff.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 592 PN 670, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |
2017-06-19 | House | In the House |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (36-14) |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-04-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |