PA SB590 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-09 - Referred to COMMERCE
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-09 - Referred to COMMERCE
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in forgery and fraudulent practices, further providing for bad checks.
Title
In forgery and fraudulent practices, further providing for bad checks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 590 PN 668, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-09 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |
2017-07-08 | House | In the House |
2017-07-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-06-13 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |