PA SB589 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-20 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-20 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions relating to home rule and optional plan government, further providing for definitions, providing for appointment of government study commission in distressed municipality and further providing for first meeting of commission, for function and duty of commission, for hearings and public forums, for report of findings and recommendations, for limitation on enactment of ordinance or filing of petition and for limitation on municipal powers.
Title
In general provisions relating to home rule and optional plan government, further providing for definitions, providing for appointment of government study commission in distressed municipality and further providing for first meeting of commission, for function and duty of commission, for hearings and public forums, for report of findings and recommendations, for limitation on enactment of ordinance or filing of petition and for limitation on municipal powers.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Kearney [D] | Sen. Scott Hutchinson [R] | Sen. Judith Ward [R] | Sen. Cris Dush [R] |
Sen. Judy Schwank [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-10-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 589 PN 714, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-07-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-20 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-10-19 | House | In the House |
2022-10-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-01-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |