PA SB586 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-26 - Re-referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: House Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-26 - Re-referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: House Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 3, 1933 (P.L.242, No.86), referred to as the Cosmetology Law, further providing for eligibility requirements for examination, for limited licenses and for requirements of a School of Cosmetology.
Title
Further providing for eligibility requirements for examination, for limited licenses and for requirements of a School of Cosmetology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 586 PN 644, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-26 | House | Re-referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2019-09-24 | House | In the House |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2019-09-23 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |