PA SB571 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-08 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-08 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in fiscal provisions relating to public assistance, providing for distribution of SNAP benefits.
Title
In fiscal provisions relating to public assistance, providing for distribution of SNAP benefits.
Sponsors
Sen. David Argall [R] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] | Sen. Mario Scavello [R] | Sen. Michael Regan [R] |
Sen. Gene Yaw [R] | Sen. Joe Pittman [R] | Sen. Kristin Phillips-Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-07 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-06-07 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |