PA SB569 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-24 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-24 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act providing for the extension of certain permits and approvals affecting the physical development of real property located in municipalities.
Title
Providing for the extension of certain permits and approvals affecting the physical development of real property located in municipalities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-25 - Senate - SB 569 PN 1215, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-03-24 | Removed from table | |
2010-03-23 | Laid on the table | |
2010-03-23 | First consideration | |
2010-03-23 | Reported as amended | |
2009-06-29 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2009-06-25 | In the House | |
2009-06-25 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-06-24 | Amended on third consideration | |
2009-06-23 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2009-06-16 | First consideration | |
2009-06-16 | Reported as amended | |
2009-03-04 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |