PA SB520 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in departmental powers and duties as to licensing, providing for prelicensure waiver of physical site requirements and further providing for regulations and for rules and regulations for personal care home and assisted living residences.
Title
In departmental powers and duties as to licensing, providing for prelicensure waiver of physical site requirements and further providing for regulations and for rules and regulations for personal care home and assisted living residences.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Adopt Amendment A00263 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-06-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |