PA SB494 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on February 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-05 - Act No. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on February 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-05 - Act No. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 11, 1996 (2nd Sp.Sess., P.L.1879, No.10), known as the Flood Insurance Education and Information Act, further providing for flood insurance education and information.
Title
Further providing for flood insurance education and information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-26 - House - House Floor: SB 494 PN 442, FP (Y: 179 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2015-07-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 494 PN 442, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 494 PN 442, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-05 | House | Act No. 3 |
2016-02-05 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2016-01-27 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2016-01-27 | House | Signed in House |
2016-01-26 | House | Signed in Senate |
2016-01-26 | House | Third consideration and final passage (179-2) |
2015-12-17 | House | Removed from table |
2015-12-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-11-30 | House | Removed from table |
2015-11-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-10-26 | House | Removed from table |
2015-10-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-07-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-08 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-06-08 | House | Second consideration |
2015-06-02 | House | Removed from table |
2015-06-01 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-06-01 | House | First consideration |
2015-06-01 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-04-24 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |
2015-04-22 | House | In the House |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-02-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |