PA SB485 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-22 - Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-22 - Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making appropriations from the Public School Employees' Retirement Fund and from the PSERS Defined Contribution Fund to provide for expenses of the Public School Employees' Retirement Board for the fiscal year July 1, 2023, to June 30, 2024, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2023.
Title
Making appropriations from the Public School Employees' Retirement Fund and from the PSERS Defined Contribution Fund to provide for expenses of the Public School Employees' Retirement Board for the fiscal year July 1, 2023, to June 30, 2024, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 485 PN 910, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A00735 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A00735 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-22 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-06-21 | House | In the House |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-06-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-06-19 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |