PA SB485 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 34 (Game) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in hunting and furtaking licenses, further providing for authorized license-issuing agents.
Title
In hunting and furtaking licenses, further providing for authorized license-issuing agents.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Laughlin [R] | Sen. Robert Mensch [R] | Sen. James Brewster [D] | Sen. Kim Ward [R] |
Sen. Michael Regan [R] | Sen. Judith Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Removed from table |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-04-30 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |