PA SB485 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on June 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-26 - Act No. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on June 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-26 - Act No. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in falsification and intimidation, further providing for the offense of impersonating a notary public or a holder of a professional or occupational license.
Title
In falsification and intimidation, further providing for the offense of impersonating a notary public or a holder of a professional or occupational license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Floor: SB 485 PN 425, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 485 PN 425, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Floor: SB 485 PN 425, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 485 PN 425, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-26 | House | Act No. 10 |
2015-06-26 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2015-06-18 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2015-06-17 | House | Signed in House |
2015-06-17 | House | Signed in Senate |
2015-06-16 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-0) |
2015-06-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-15 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-06-15 | House | Second consideration |
2015-06-10 | House | Removed from table |
2015-06-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-06-09 | House | First consideration |
2015-06-09 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-04-20 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2015-04-15 | House | In the House |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-03-03 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |