PA SB484 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Act No. 63 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Act No. 63 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 24, 2015 (P.L.232, No.64), known as the Pennsylvania Long-term Care Council Act, further providing for Pennsylvania Long-term Care Council.
Title
Further providing for Pennsylvania Long-term Care Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Floor: SB 484 PN 500, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 484 PN 500, Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Floor: SB 484 PN 500, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 484 PN 500, Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | House | Act No. 63 of 2021 |
2021-06-30 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2021-06-28 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2021-06-25 | House | Signed in House |
2021-06-25 | House | Signed in Senate |
2021-06-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2021-06-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-23 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-23 | House | Second consideration |
2021-06-22 | House | Removed from table |
2021-06-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-06-21 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-06-08 | House | Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES |
2021-06-07 | House | In the House |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-0) |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Referred to AGING AND YOUTH |