PA SB479 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act No. 31
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act No. 31
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in depositions and witnesses, further providing for admissibility of certain statements.
Title
In depositions and witnesses, further providing for admissibility of certain statements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Floor: SB 479 PN 498, FP (Y: 199 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 479 PN 498, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Floor: SB 479 PN 498, FP (Y: 199 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 479 PN 498, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Act No. 31 |
2019-06-28 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2019-06-20 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2019-06-19 | House | Signed in House |
2019-06-19 | House | Signed in Senate |
2019-06-19 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-1) |
2019-06-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-18 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-18 | House | Second consideration |
2019-06-17 | House | Removed from table |
2019-06-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-06-11 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-11 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2019-04-09 | House | In the House |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-0) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-03-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |