PA SB469 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on October 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - Re-referred to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - Re-referred to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of February 2, 1966 (1965 P.L.1860, No.586), entitled "An act encouraging landowners to make land and water areas available to the public for recreational purposes by limiting liability in connection therewith, and repealing certain acts," providing for a short title; further providing for definitions; and making editorial changes.
Title
Amending the act of February 2, 1966 (1965 P.L.1860, No.586), entitled "An act encouraging landowners to make land and water areas available to the public for recreational purposes by limiting liability in connection therewith, and repealing certain acts," providing for a short title; further providing for definitions; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Boscola [D] | Sen. Edwin Erickson [R] | Sen. Wayne Fontana [D] | Sen. John Rafferty [R] |
Sen. Patricia Vance [R] | Sen. David Argall [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-10-25 - Senate - SB 469 PN 1164, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | House | Re-referred to RULES |
2012-03-12 | House | Removed from table |
2012-02-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-02-08 | House | First consideration |
2012-02-08 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-10-26 | House | Referred to TOURISM AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |
2011-10-25 | House | In the House |
2011-10-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2011-10-24 | Senate | Removed from table |
2011-06-28 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2011-06-08 | Senate | Removed from table |
2011-06-08 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2011-06-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2011-05-03 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |