PA SB462 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 23 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-09-24 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Status: Engrossed on September 23 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-09-24 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Summary
An Act amending the act of February 1, 1966 (1965 P.L.1656, No.581), known as The Borough Code, further providing for ordinances to require sewer connections.
Title
An Act amending the act of February 1, 1966 (1965 P.L.1656, No.581), known as The Borough Code, further providing for ordinances to require sewer connections.
Sponsors
Sen. Gibson Armstrong [R] | Sen. Andrew Dinniman [D] | Sen. Stewart Greenleaf [R] | Sen. John Rafferty [R] |
Sen. Donald White [R] | Sen. Mary White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-09-24 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2008-09-23 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2008-09-22 | Second consideration | |
2008-09-18 | First consideration | |
2008-09-18 | Reported as amended | |
2007-03-15 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=462 |