PA SB458 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on December 12 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-12-12 - Presented to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 66 (Public Utilities) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in contract carrier by motor vehicle and broker, further providing for declaration of policy and definitions; and, in violations and penalties, further providing for unauthorized operation by carriers and brokers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In general provisions, further providing for definitions; in contract carrier by motor vehicle and broker, further providing for declaration of policy and definitions; and, in violations and penalties, further providing for unauthorized operation by carriers and brokers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-11 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 458 PN 1362, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - House - House Floor: SB 458 PN 1362, FP (Y: 145 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - House - House Floor: SB 458 PN 1362, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, CUTLER (Y: 167 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - House Floor: SB 458 PN 711, 2017 A4618, METZGAR (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 458 PN 711, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-12SenatePresented to the Governor
2017-12-12SenateSigned in House
2017-12-11SenateSigned in Senate
2017-12-11SenateSenate concurred in House amendments (49-0)
2017-12-11SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2017-12-11SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2017-12-06SenateIn the Senate
2017-12-06HouseThird consideration and final passage (145-42)
2017-12-06HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-12-05HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-12-05HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2017-12-04HouseRemoved from table
2017-10-25HouseLaid on the table
2017-10-25HouseFirst consideration
2017-10-25HouseReported as committed
2017-06-29HouseReferred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS
2017-06-28HouseIn the House
2017-06-28SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2017-06-05SenateRe-reported as committed
2017-04-25SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-04-25SenateSecond consideration
2017-04-18SenateFirst consideration
2017-04-18SenateReported as amended
2017-02-28SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=458
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0458&pn=0451
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0458&pn=0711
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0458&pn=1362
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=7&theDate=04/18/2017&RollCallId=98
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/05/2017&RollCallId=219
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=194
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=10&theDate=10/25/2017&RollCallId=1045
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=876
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=889
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=890
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/06/2017&RollCallId=1129
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=356
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=12/11/2017&RollCallId=560

Bill Comments

feedback