PA SB454 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, providing for volunteer firefighter tax credit.
Title
Providing for volunteer firefighter tax credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |