PA SB454 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-18 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-18 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in public assistance, providing for public notice of provider payment rates for individuals with an intellectual disability or autism.
Title
In public assistance, providing for public notice of provider payment rates for individuals with an intellectual disability or autism.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-18 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |