PA SB442 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-06 - Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
Pending: Senate Rules & Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-06 - Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
Pending: Senate Rules & Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, providing for State-owned assets, county-owned assets and broadband services; establishing the Broadband Services Restricted Account; and providing for 2022-2023 budget implementation for State-related universities.
Title
Providing for State-owned assets, county-owned assets and broadband services; establishing the Broadband Services Restricted Account; and providing for 2022-2023 budget implementation for State-related universities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-06 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A05336 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-06 - House - House Floor: SB 442 PN 1846, FP (Y: 109 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-07-06 - House - House Floor: SB 442 PN , SB 1284 PROCEED WITH BILLS, BENNINGHOFF (Y: 170 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Floor: SB 442 PN 460, 2021 A1787, LAWRENCE (Y: 150 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 442 PN 460, Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Communications And Technology: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-06 - House - House Floor: SB 442 PN 1846, FP (Y: 109 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-07-06 - House - House Floor: SB 442 PN , SB 1284 PROCEED WITH BILLS, BENNINGHOFF (Y: 170 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Floor: SB 442 PN 460, 2021 A1787, LAWRENCE (Y: 150 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 442 PN 460, Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Communications And Technology: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-06 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2022-07-06 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-07-06 | House | Third consideration and final passage (109-91) |
2022-07-06 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2022-07-06 | House | Amended in House Committee on APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-21 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-21 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2021-06-16 | House | Removed from table |
2021-06-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-06-15 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-05-26 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |
2021-05-25 | House | In the House |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (27-20) |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-04-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNICATIONS AND TECHNOLOGY |