PA SB419 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-23 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-23 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in rules of the road in general, further providing for speed timing devices.
Title
In rules of the road in general, further providing for speed timing devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 419 PN 932, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 419 PN 418, 2021 A19290, SCAVELLO Amendment No. A-1929 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 419 PN 418, 2021 A19290, SCAVELLO Amendment No. A-1929 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-23 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2021-06-22 | House | In the House |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-1) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (50-0) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-05-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |