PA SB327 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-27 - Act No. 13A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-27 - Act No. 13A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Supplement to the act of July 28, 1966 (3rd Sp.Sess., P.L.87, No.3), known as the University of Pittsburgh--Commonwealth Act, making appropriations for carrying the same into effect; and providing for a basis for payments of such appropriations, for a method of accounting for the funds appropriated and for certain fiscal information disclosure.
Title
A Supplement to the act of July 28, 1966 (3rd Sp.Sess., P.L.87, No.3), known as the University of Pittsburgh--Commonwealth Act, making appropriations for carrying the same into effect; and providing for a basis for payments of such appropriations, for a method of accounting for the funds appropriated and for certain fiscal information disclosure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-10-25 - House - House Floor: SB 327 PN 1060, FP (Y: 181 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-07-07 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 327 PN 1060, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-07 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 327 PN 1060, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-27 | House | Act No. 13A |
2017-10-27 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2017-10-26 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2017-10-25 | House | Signed in House |
2017-10-25 | House | Signed in Senate |
2017-10-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (181-5) |
2017-10-04 | House | Removed from table |
2017-10-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-07-08 | House | Second consideration |
2017-07-07 | House | Removed from table |
2017-07-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-07-07 | House | First consideration |
2017-07-07 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-06-30 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-30 | House | In the House |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-06-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |