PA SB325 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-07 - Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS
Pending: House Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-07 - Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS
Pending: House Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act providing for gas and hazardous liquids pipelines and for powers and duties of the Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission; and imposing civil penalties.
Title
Providing for gas and hazardous liquids pipelines and for powers and duties of the Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission; and imposing civil penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - SB 325 PN 981, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-07 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |
2011-04-06 | House | In the House |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-1) |
2011-04-05 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2011-03-07 | Senate | Second consideration |
2011-02-28 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2011-02-16 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-02-14 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-02-14 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2011-01-28 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |