PA SB322 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-14 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-14 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), known as the Pennsylvania Election Code, in voting by qualified absentee electors, further providing for canvassing of official absentee ballots and mail-in ballots.
Title
In voting by qualified absentee electors, further providing for canvassing of official absentee ballots and mail-in ballots.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-14 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Removed from table |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-01-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |