PA SB304 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 5, 1936 (2nd Sp.Sess., 1937 P.L.2897, No.1), known as the Unemployment Compensation Law, in compensation, further providing for ineligibility for compensation.
Title
In compensation, further providing for ineligibility for compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-04-09 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |