PA SB299 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 127
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), known as the Pennsylvania Election Code, in nomination of candidates, further providing for number of signers required for nomination petitions of candidates at primaries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In nomination of candidates, further providing for number of signers required for nomination petitions of candidates at primaries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-10 - House - House Floor: SB 299 PN 1849, FP (Y: 128 N: 65 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-10-10 - House - House Floor: SB 299 PN 1849, MOT CONST, ROAE (Y: 120 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Floor: SB 299 PN 1849, 2017 A10037, SUSP RULES, DIAMOND (Y: 76 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2018-10-09 - House - House Floor: SB 299 PN 1849, 2017 A10036, SUSP RULES, DIAMOND (Y: 71 N: 120 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2018-09-25 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 299 PN 1849, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 299 PN 1636, A7503, TARTAGLIONE AMENDMENT NO. A-7503 (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-24HouseAct No. 127
2018-10-24HouseApproved by the Governor
2018-10-15HousePresented to the Governor
2018-10-15HouseSigned in House
2018-10-12HouseSigned in Senate
2018-10-10HouseThird consideration and final passage (128-65)
2018-10-10HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-10-09HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-10-09HouseSecond consideration
2018-10-02HouseRemoved from table
2018-09-25HouseLaid on the table
2018-09-25HouseFirst consideration
2018-09-25HouseReported as committed
2018-06-14HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2018-06-12HouseIn the House
2018-06-12SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-06-11SenateAmended on third consideration (46-3)
2018-06-06SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-05-23SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-05-23SenateSecond consideration
2018-04-17SenateFirst consideration
2018-04-17SenateReported as committed
2018-04-09SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=299
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0299&pn=1636
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0299&pn=1849
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=41&theDate=04/17/2018&RollCallId=765
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/06/2018&RollCallId=904
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=534
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=545
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=09/25/2018&RollCallId=1946
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1513
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1514
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1523
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1536
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/10/2018&RollCallId=2053

Bill Comments

feedback