PA SB291 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Act No. 21 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Act No. 21 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for the capital budget for the fiscal year 2021-2022.
Title
Providing for the capital budget for the fiscal year 2021-2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - House Floor: SB 291 PN 1273, FP (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Floor: SB 291 PN 1273, REV PRIOR PN 294, FIEDLER (Y: 87 N: 113 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-07 - House - House Floor: SB 291 PN 1273, 2021 A3577 (Y: 87 N: 113 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-07 - House - House Floor: SB 291 PN 1273, 2021 A3270 (Y: 88 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-01-25 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 291 PN 1273, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A01150 (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - House Floor: SB 291 PN 1273, FP (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Floor: SB 291 PN 1273, REV PRIOR PN 294, FIEDLER (Y: 87 N: 113 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-07 - House - House Floor: SB 291 PN 1273, 2021 A3577 (Y: 87 N: 113 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-07 - House - House Floor: SB 291 PN 1273, 2021 A3270 (Y: 88 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-01-25 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 291 PN 1273, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A01150 (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | House | Act No. 21 of 2022 |
2022-05-26 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2022-05-25 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2022-05-25 | House | Signed in House |
2022-05-25 | House | Signed in Senate |
2022-05-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (203-0) |
2022-05-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-02-07 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-02-07 | House | Second consideration |
2022-01-26 | House | Removed from table |
2022-01-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-01-25 | House | First consideration |
2022-01-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-12-20 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-12-15 | House | In the House |
2021-12-15 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-06-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |