PA SB267 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-18 - Act No. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-18 - Act No. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in pupils and attendance, further providing for excuses from attending school; and making an editorial change.
Title
In pupils and attendance, further providing for excuses from attending school; and making an editorial change.
Sponsors
Sen. Stewart Greenleaf [R] | Sen. Christine Tartaglione [D] | Sen. Judy Schwank [D] | Sen. James Brewster [D] |
Sen. Jim Ferlo [D] | Sen. Lloyd Smucker [R] | Sen. Timothy Solobay [D] | Sen. Michael Waugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-07 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-20 - Senate - SB 267 PN 1576, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-18 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-20 - Senate - SB 267 PN 1576, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-18 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-18 | Senate | Act No. 40 |
2014-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (49-0) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2014-04-02 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-04-02 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2014-04-02 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-04-01 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-04-01 | House | Second consideration |
2014-03-31 | House | Removed from table |
2014-03-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-03-19 | House | First consideration |
2014-03-19 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-11-25 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |
2013-11-20 | House | In the House |
2013-11-20 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2013-11-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-11-18 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-02-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |