PA SB263 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on October 9 2008 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 123
Status: Enrolled on October 9 2008 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 123
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 21, 1939 (P.L.566, No.284), known as The Pennsylvania Occupational Disease Act, providing further benefits.
Title
An Act amending the act of June 21, 1939 (P.L.566, No.284), known as The Pennsylvania Occupational Disease Act, providing further benefits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-10-09 | Approved by the Governor | |
2008-10-09 | Presented to the Governor | |
2008-10-08 | Signed in House | |
2008-10-08 | Signed in Senate | |
2008-10-08 | Senate concurred in House amendments | |
2008-10-08 | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed | |
2008-10-07 | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS | |
2008-10-07 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2008-10-06 | Second consideration | |
2008-10-06 | Re-reported as committed | |
2008-09-24 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-09-24 | Removed from table | |
2008-09-24 | Laid on the table | |
2008-09-24 | First consideration | |
2008-09-24 | Reported as amended | |
2007-03-22 | Referred to LABOR RELATIONS | |
2007-03-21 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-03-20 | Second consideration | |
2007-03-19 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-03-14 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-03-13 | First consideration | |
2007-03-13 | Reported as committed | |
2007-03-05 | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=263 |