PA SB253 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for regulatory compliance.
Title
Providing for regulatory compliance.
Sponsors
Sen. Kristin Phillips-Hill [R] | Sen. Michael Folmer [R] | Sen. Judith Ward [R] | Sen. Patrick Browne [R] |
Sen. Doug Mastriano [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Intergovernmental Operations: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Intergovernmental Operations: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-18 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-06-10 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Referred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL OPERATIONS |